웹2024년 8월 3일 · Barun Kumar Sahu IAS. Shri Barun Kumar Sahu IAS (Tripura 1992) presently Principal Secretary, Govt. of Tripura, Home [including Jail and Fire Service] and … 웹2024년 6월 23일 · vijay kumar sahu News: Latest and Breaking News on vijay kumar sahu. Explore vijay kumar sahu profile at Times of India for photos, videos and latest news of vijay kumar sahu. Also find news ...
Barun Kumar Sahu IAS put on waiting for posting
웹2024년 6월 13일 · i) Premature repatriation of Shri Barun Kumar Sahu, IAS(TR:92), CVO, Hindustan Paper Corporation Ltd. (HPC), Kolkata to his parent cadre. ii) Entrustment of additional charge of the post of CVO, HPC to Shri Deepak Kumar, IPS(JK:93), CVO, Heavy Engineering Corporation (HEC), Ranchi, initially for a period 웹2024년 5월 11일 · IAS Varun Kumar Baranwal, A Name in the history of UPSC worth remembering. A boy who lost his father at an early stage of life. His mom used to work in her own cycle repairing shop. A sister who helped her mom with all the work and even took tuition to help his brother in studies. Additionally, He had no money to pay his college fee. phytoral gummies
*1!- No.F.6(1)-GA(P&T)/13; Dated,Agartala,-the/47
웹Barun Kumar Sahu (IAS) 0.00 · Rating details · 0 ratings · 0 reviews This book is a treatise on vigilance, compliance and anti-corruption. It is based on empirical and realistic approach to the subject, with some interpretations from ancient wisdoms. The ... 웹2024년 3월 30일 · Mr Sahu has replaced 1993 batch Senior IAS officer Mr. Nikunja Bihari Dhal, who was appointed as the SRC of Odisha in February this year. ... Kumar retired as the infrastructure and industrial development commissioner on February 28, 2024. Movements. Durga Shakti Nagpal Becomes DM For The First Time. 웹2024년 1월 1일 · Shri Barun Kumar Sahu Id No. 014900 11/10/1992;RR sahubk: 21/04/1969 1992;TR Jharkhand 52 Years: 4: Shri Nagaraju Maddirala Id No. 015600 05/09/1993;RR … phyto rap